Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Koudougou

Dioecesis Kuduguensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joachim Ouédraogo, Bishop
  • Basile Tapsoba, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ouagadougou
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Burkina Faso
  • Square Kilometers: 26,000 (10,042 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 34, Koudougou, Burkina Faso
  • Telephone: 44.00.70
  • Fax: 44.01.78

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ouahigouya
12 June 1947ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou Prefecture Apostolic of Ouahigouya (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Koudougou
14 June 1954ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ouahigouya Vicariate Apostolic of Koudougou
Diocese of Koudougou
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Koudougou Diocese of Koudougou
23 June 1958Territory LostDiocese of Koudougou Diocese of Ouahigouya (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Ouahigouya
195010,024864,4991.2%1232441786ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Koudougou
Diocese of Koudougou
196938,106754,0005.1%53540952555610ap1971
198079,829903,1068.8%1427411,947477212ap1981
1990123,7011,243,9559.9%2715422,945307612ap1991
1997173,7641,427,93112.2%5610662,632278712ap2000
2000280,9271,365,26720.6%559644,389279713ap2001
2001172,4641,388,10212.4%569652,6532910014ap2002
2002254,6771,449,98617.6%5910693,6902910514ap2003
2003254,3251,450,88317.5%5811693,6853010516ap2004
2004228,7801,525,81015.0%5910693,315246816ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 24 Dec 2011