Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Caquetá

Apostolicus Vicariatus de Caquetá

Territory Lost

To: Prefecture Apostolic of Leticia



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Caquetá
20 December 1904ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Caquetá (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Caquetá
31 May 1930ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Caquetá Vicariate Apostolic of Caquetá
8 February 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Caquetá Vicariate Apostolic of Florencia (erected)
8 February 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Caquetá Vicariate Apostolic of Sibundoy (erected)
8 February 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Caquetá Prefecture Apostolic of Leticia (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Caquetá
195098,500100,00098.5%126273,648167611ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 2 Dec 2012