Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Josep Pujol i Coll, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Caquetá, Colombia

Titular See: (Fidel de Montclar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1867Born
1882²14.0EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1892²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Jan 190537.0AppointedPrefect of Caquetá, Colombia
31 May 193062.4ResignedPrefect of Caquetá, Colombia
21 Mar 193466.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Caquetá, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josep Pujol i Coll
Father Josep Pujol i Coll O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Caquetá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontclar, Spain
Death PlaceArenys de Mar, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain

  • a priest for 42.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast