Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lelio (Aurelio) Zibramonti (Gibramontis)

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Mar 1583AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
1 May 1583Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
14 Nov 1583AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
1589²DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lelio (Aurelio) Zibramonti (Gibramontis)
Bishop Lelio (Aurelio) Zibramonti (Gibramontis) (died 1589) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantova, Diocese of Mantova
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo of Lucina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Trinità dei Monti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100, and Page 155
  • ob/c2: AT, 25 Apr 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,372
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1583, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast