Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Yáñez Gutiérrez de Aguilar

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Aug 1361AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
12 Mar 1362Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 1363Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
1372¹DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Yáñez Gutiérrez de Aguilar:
Bishop Nicolás Yáñez Gutiérrez de Aguilar , Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a priest for 9.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 304, Number 162
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014