Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Johann Joseph Wolsky von Bärenstamm

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1692BornCrostwitz
18 Dec 171725.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
2 Apr 171825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
4 Apr 174350.6AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
9 Apr 175360.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
24 Jun 175360.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
3 Dec 177179.3DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jakob Johann Joseph Wolsky von Bärenstamm:
Bishop Jakob Johann Joseph Wolsky von Bärenstamm (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,306
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 333, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015