Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hieronim Wierzbowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

Titular Bishop of FesseŽ


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1648Born
22 Sep 168133.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
22 Sep 168133.1AppointedTitular Bishop of FesseŽ
12 Apr 168233.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of FesseŽ
May 1712³63.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hieronim Wierzbowski:
Bishop Hieronim Wierzbowski (born , died May 1712) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,446
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1682, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015