Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich von Wirsberg

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1507Born
28 Feb 154537.2Ordained PriestPriest
4 Nov 155850.9AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
9 Apr 155951.3Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
12 Nov 157365.9DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Wirsberg (VIAF: 3735087)
Bishop Friedrich von Wirsberg (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: CB, 23 Mar 2014
  • b: Germania Sacra: Neue Folge, Volume 13, Page 132
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,014
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1559, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast