Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Walsh

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579¹Born
27 Apr 162647.3AppointedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
7 Jun 162647.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
4 May 165475.3DiedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Walsh
Archbishop Thomas Walsh (born 1579, died ) Archbishop of Cashel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaterford

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 138
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast