Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard O’Connell

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹BornIveragh
16 Sep 164160.7AppointedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
10 Jun 1643³62.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
13 Jul 165372.5DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard O’Connell:
Bishop Richard O’Connell (died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015