Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gabriel Cardinal Trejo y Paniagua

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola

Archbishop (Personal Title) of Málaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹BornCasas de Millán, Spain
2 Dec 161553.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jun 161755.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
29 Nov 162159.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
9 Jun 162563.4AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
28 Apr 162765.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Málaga, Spain
12 Feb 163068.1DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Trejo y Paniagua:
Cardinal Gabriel Trejo y Paniagua (died ) Archbishop of Salerno

  • a cardinal for 14.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Dec 1615
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013