Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Peter Cardinal von Schaumberg

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg

Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1388BornMitwitz in Franken
1423²34.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
27 Feb 142436.0AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
1426¹37.9Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
18 Dec 143951.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 143951.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
12 Apr 146981.1DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter von Schaumberg:
Peter Cardinal von Schaumberg (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.3 years
  • a cardinal for 29.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,601
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 117
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 98
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Mar 2014