Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm von Reichenau

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1426²Born
16 Jan 146438.0SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
12 Mar 146438.1ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
23 May 146438.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 146438.4Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
18 Nov 149670.8DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm von Reichenau
Bishop Wilhelm von Reichenau (born 1426, died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurggriesbach

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 152
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast