Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johann Cardinal von Eych

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1404¹BornThüringen
1 Oct 144541.8AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
13 Mar 144642.2Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
31 May 146258.4Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jan 146460.0DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann von Eych:
Cardinal Johann von Eych (died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
  • a cardinal for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 152
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,760
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013