Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ghislain de Vroede

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1521¹Born
13 Mar 157049.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
13 Mar 157049.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Selymbria
23 Apr 157049.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selymbria
14 Aug 157958.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ghislain de Vroede
Bishop Ghislain de Vroede (born 1521, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDunkerque
Ordained BishopSte Gudule, Bruxelles
Death PlaceBruxelles

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 10 Nov 2017