Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Vitoria, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1577SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
13 Jan 1578ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
18 Nov 1578Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
1592²DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Vitoria
Bishop Francisco de Vitoria O.P. (died 1592) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortugal
Ordained BishopSanta Maria de los Angeles, Monastery, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
Death PlaceAtocha, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 13.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 320
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,723
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,578, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast