Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Valledor Fresno

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1668¹BornOsma
12 Apr 172355.3AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
4 Jul 172355.5Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
12 Feb 173062.1DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Valledor Fresno:
Bishop Jacinto Valledor Fresno (died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,540
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013