Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo de Vadillo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefal¨, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1506¹Born
9 Feb 156963.1AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
21 Mar 156963.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
1 Feb 157771.0DiedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo de Vadillo (VIAF: 283187037)
Bishop Rodrigo de Vadillo O.S.B. (born 1506, died ) Bishop of Cefal¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArÚvalo, Diocese of ┴vila, Spain
Ordained BishopPope's Chapel, St. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCefal¨, Diocese of Cefal¨

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 163
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,357
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 80, Number 480
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1569, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast