Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaspar Cardinal Cervantes de Gaete

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1511²Born
19 Nov 156150.8AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
1 Mar 156453.1AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
23 Jul 156857.5AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
17 May 157059.3Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 157059.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
16 Jun 157059.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
23 Jan 157261.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
17 Oct 157564.7DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Cervantes de Gaete (VIAF: 88802677)
Gaspar Cardinal Cervantes de Gaete (born 1511, died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrujillo, Diocese of Plasencia
Death PlaceTarragona, Archdiocese of Tarragona
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Tarragona, Archdiocese of Tarragona

  • a cardinal for 5.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 71, Number 419
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 289, and Page 309
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 242
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 41*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast