Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Salvio, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1491¹Born
26 Aug 156978.6AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
4 Oct 156978.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
9 Feb 157786.1DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Salvio
Bishop Ambrogio Salvio O.P. (born 1491, died ) Bishop of Nard˛

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnoli Irpino
Ordained PriestSan Domenico, Monastery, Bagnoli
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceS. Tommaso d’Aquino, Monastery, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Original)S. Tommaso d’Aquino, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 256
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 16, Number 55
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1569, Number 17
  • b/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast