Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adolf von Schauenburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1511Born
17 Dec 153322.9SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
27 Aug 153524.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
3 May 154736.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 154736.7SucceededArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
18 Apr 154837.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 Sep 155645.7DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Adolf von Schauenburg (VIAF: 25521922)
Archbishop Adolf von Schauenburg (born 1511, died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAugsburg, Diocese of Augsburg

  • a priest for 9.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 2 Oct 2017