Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hugh McCaughwell, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576¹BornDown
27 Apr 162650.3AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
7 Jun 162650.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
22 Sep 162650.7DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugh McCaughwell:
Archbishop Hugh McCaughwell O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Armagh

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 95
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015