Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Tritonio

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹BornUtinen
9 Feb 160934.1AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
22 Feb 160934.1Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
15 Jun 163156.5DiedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Tritonio:
Bishop Leonardo Tritonio (died ) Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 274
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 46, Number 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013