Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Tornabuoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1504¹Born
15 Oct 153026.7AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
16 Oct 153026.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
29 Oct 154642.8AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
1557²53.0ResignedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
1577²73.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Tornabuoni
Bishop Alfonso Tornabuoni (born 1504, died 1577) Bishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 46.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 290, and Page 143
  • ob/c2: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,630
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1530, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast