Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Werner von Wolf-Metternich zu Gracht

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1625BornGracht
4 Jun 167852.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
15 Sep 168358.1SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
24 Apr 168458.7ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
10 Sep 168459.1Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
21 May 170478.8DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hermann Werner von Wolf-Metternich zu Gracht:
Bishop Hermann Werner von Wolf-Metternich zu Gracht (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013