Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann (Jan) Filipec z Prostějov, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

Member of Order of Friars Minor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1431¹BornProstějov
23 May 147746.3AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
1484²53.0AppointedAdministrator of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
1490¹59.0ResignedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
1490²59.0ResignedAdministrator of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
20 May 149261.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jun 150978.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann (Jan) Filipec z Prostějov (VIAF: 6289452)
Bishop Johann (Jan) Filipec z Prostějov O.F.M. (born 1431, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016