Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thurstan de Bayeux

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1070¹Born
15 Aug 111444.6AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
Dec 1114³44.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Jun 111545.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Oct 111949.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
21 Jan 114070.0ResignedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
5 Feb 114070.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of York, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thurstan de Bayeux
Archbishop Thurstan de Bayeux (born 1070, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBayeux, France

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 43
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 98
  • b/c2: CB, 15 Feb 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,822

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018