Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geoffrey Rufus

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1133¹AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
6 Aug 1133Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
6 May 1140DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Geoffrey Rufus
Bishop Geoffrey Rufus (died ) Bishop of Durham

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 45
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 283
  • b/c2: CB, 15 Feb 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,825

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018