Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ranulf Flambard

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1060¹BornBayeux
29 May 109939.4AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
5 Jun 109939.4Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
5 Sep 112868.6DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ranulf Flambard
Bishop Ranulf Flambard (born 1060, died ) Bishop of Durham

  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 41
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 282
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,819

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 31 Mar 2016