Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Talento de’ Talenti

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1594³Born
3 Dec 164046.0AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
9 Dec 164046.0Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
1651¹56.1DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Talento de’ Talenti
Bishop Talento de’ Talenti (born , died 1651) Bishop of Montepulciano

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 248
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast