Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Borković, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607¹Born
19 Nov 166760.8SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
11 Jun 166861.4ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
23 Dec 166861.9Ordained BishopBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
31 Oct 168780.8DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Borković
Bishop Martin Borković O.S.P.P.E. (born 1607, died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDomagovich

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 164, and Page 421
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018