Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Campeggio

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Administrator of Salisbury, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1474BornMilan
12 Nov 151238.0AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
1 Jul 151742.7Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jan 151843.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
6 Apr 151843.4Ordained BishopBishop of Feltre, Italy
13 Nov 151945.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
1 Jun 152045.6ResignedBishop of Feltre, Italy
2 Dec 152349.1AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
2 Dec 152450.1AppointedAdministrator of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
27 Apr 152853.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
2 Sep 153055.8AppointedAdministrator of Huesca, Spain
2 Oct 153257.9ResignedAdministrator of Huesca, Spain
6 Jun 153358.6AppointedAdministrator of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
17 Jun 153459.6AppointedAdministrator of Candia, Greece
5 Sep 153459.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
26 Feb 153560.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
28 Jan 153661.2ResignedAdministrator of Candia, Greece
28 May 153762.6ResignedAdministrator of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
28 Nov 153763.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
19 Jul 153964.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Campeggio:
Cardinal Lorenzo Campeggio (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a bishop for 21.3 years
  • a cardinal for 22.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 605
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 292
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 98
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 32, Number 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014