Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Strikland

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England


Events

DateEventTitle
1396AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
24 Dec 1399AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
15 Aug 1400Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
30 Aug 1419DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for William Strikland:
Bishop William Strikland (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,806
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 289
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 236, and Page 237
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013