Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Aliotti

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jun 1392AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenai {Athens}, Greece
1 Jun 1398AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Volterra, Italy
6 Apr 1411DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Aliotti:
Archbishop Luigi Aliotti (died ) Bishop of Volterra

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 536, and Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013