Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Appleby

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jun 1363AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
18 Jun 1363Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
5 Dec 1395DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Appleby
Bishop Thomas Appleby (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 289
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 79
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast