Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Spera, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateEventTitle
11 May 1587AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
24 May 1587Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
28 Oct 1587DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

MicroData Summary for Francesco Spera
Archbishop Francesco Spera O.F.M. (died ) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Esprit des Napolitains, Via Giulia, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 254
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 26, Number 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast