Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso Antonio de San Martín

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹BornMadrid
1 Oct 167533.7SelectedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
16 Dec 167533.9ConfirmedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
Apr 1676³34.2Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
21 Oct 168139.8AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
5 Jul 170563.5DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alonso Antonio de San Martín:
Bishop Alonso Antonio de San Martín (born 1642, died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 167, and Page 300
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 213, Number 1,330
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015