Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Simancas Simancas

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jun 1556AppointedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
5 Dec 1561AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
Apr 1564³Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
1570²DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Simancas Simancas
Bishop Juan Simancas Simancas (died 1570) Bishop of Cartagena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba, Spain
Ordained BishopBogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Death PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba, Spain

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 74, Number 437
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 154, and Page 330
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 2
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 67, Number 388
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1557, Number 2*
  • b: CB, 28 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast