Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal Martínez Silíceo

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1486²Born
23 Feb 154155.1AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
8 Jan 154660.0AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
20 Dec 155569.9Elevated to Cardinal
1 Feb 155670.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
31 May 155771.4DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Martínez Silíceo (VIAF: 45127398)
Juan Cardinal Martínez Silíceo (born 1486, died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillagarcía de la Torre, Diocese of Badajoz
Death PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a cardinal for 1.4 years

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 53, Number 287
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 154, and Page 314
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1555
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast