Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Severi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tricomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Feb 1680BornReatin
19 Dec 172242.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 172747.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
30 Mar 172747.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Severi:
Bishop Tommaso Severi , Titular Bishop of Tricomia

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 389
  • ob/c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014