Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Šimun Vosić (Vossich)

Deceased

Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Oct 1461AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
26 Nov 1473AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
28 Nov 1473AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
Aug 1482³DiedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Šimun Vosić (Vossich):
Archbishop Šimun Vosić (Vossich) , Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 89, and Page 213
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Aug 2014