Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Guzmán, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572²Born
11 Jul 162250.5AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
6 Nov 162250.8Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
6 Oct 162755.7AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
6 Jun 163361.4AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
1 Mar 163462.1DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Guzmán:
Archbishop Juan Guzmán O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,390
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 126, and Page 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 328
  • b: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 143, Number 911
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015