Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominico Maria Saporiti

Deceased

Bishop of Accia and Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1692BornGenova
2 Apr 171825.5Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 174754.9AppointedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
13 Aug 174754.9Ordained BishopBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
Apr 1772³79.5DiedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominico Maria Saporiti:
Bishop Dominico Maria Saporiti (born , died Apr 1772) Bishop of Accia and Mariana

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015