Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Publio Maria Sant

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1779³BornValletta
21 Dec 180526.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 181738.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Laranda
28 Jun 181838.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laranda
12 Apr 184767.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Malta
17 Nov 184768.2SucceededBishop of Malta
17 Nov 184768.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
15 Jun 184868.8InstalledBishop of Malta
4 Dec 185778.3ResignedBishop of Malta
4 Dec 185778.3ResignedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
28 Oct 186485.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Malta

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Publio Maria Sant:
Archbishop Publio Maria Sant (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Malta

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 46.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 378
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 231

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013