Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Mattei

Deceased

Bishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1761BornSenglea
23 Dec 180544.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
1806²44.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
12 Jun 180745.9SelectedBishop of Malta
18 Sep 180746.2ConfirmedBishop of Malta
14 Jul 182968.0DiedBishop of Malta

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Mattei:
Bishop Ferdinando Mattei (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a bishop for 23.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 260, and Page 298
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,481

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013