Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Caruana

Deceased

Bishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1759BornRuano
20 Dec 178324.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 183171.6AppointedBishop of Malta
15 May 183171.9Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
21 Jun 183172.0InstalledBishop of Malta
17 Nov 184788.4DiedBishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Caruana:
Bishop Francesco Saverio Caruana (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,953
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013