Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Alvise Sagredo

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1617³BornVenice
21 Sep 167861.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
25 Sep 167861.7Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
3 Oct 167861.8AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
30 Oct 167861.8Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
13 Sep 168871.7DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alvise Sagredo:
Patriarch Alvise Sagredo (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 10.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 409
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Sep 2014