Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Christopher Cardinal Bainbridge

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1464BornHilton, Westmorland
27 Aug 150743.7AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
12 Dec 1507³43.9Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
22 Sep 150844.7AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
10 Mar 151147.2Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 151147.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
22 Dec 151148.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
14 Jul 151450.5DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christopher Bainbridge:
Cardinal Christopher Bainbridge (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
  • a cardinal for 3.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1511
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 112, and Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 190, and Page 189
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013