Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Rustici

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tropea


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jun 1570AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
2 Jul 1570Ordained BishopBishop of Tropea, Italy
30 Mar 1593ResignedBishop of Tropea, Italy
2 Jan 1594DiedBishop Emeritus of Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Rustici:
Bishop Girolamo Rustici (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tropea

  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 347
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 320
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 17, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013