Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Georg Cardinal Heßler (Hessler)

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Orphea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1427¹Born
1456¹29.0Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
10 Dec 147750.9Elevated to Cardinal
12 Dec 147750.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Orphea
28 Jan 148053.0AppointedBishop of Passau, Germany
13 Feb 148053.1Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
21 Sep 148255.7DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg Heßler (Hessler) (VIAF: 32834741)
Georg Cardinal Heßler (Hessler) (born 1427, died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBamberg, Diocese of Bamberg
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
  • a cardinal for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,380
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1480, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 1 Dec 2018

Quantcast